Shumard v. Pilot Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donald Shumard
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC and Pilot Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00426
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 second motion for extension of time to answer. Answer or responsive motion due on 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/8/19. (rmg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants (Busey, Zachary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/23/19. (rmg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/19/2019. (sj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jenna M. Bedsole. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3501583. Filed by Pilot Corporation, Pilot Travel Centers LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Busey, Zachary)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to answer. Answer or responsive motion due 08/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/12/2019. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants (Busey, Zachary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of All Defendants (Busey, Zachary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case, currently assigned to the docket of Judge Susan Webber Wright, due to her senior status. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/18/2019. (jbh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Shumard. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072656.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumard v. Pilot Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Represented By: Jenna M. Bedsole
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Corporation
Represented By: Jenna M. Bedsole
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Shumard
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?