Goodman v. De Wafelbakkers LLC
Plaintiff: William Goodman
Defendant: De Wafelbakkers LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00427
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/23/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/7/2019. Bench Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/15/19. (mmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by De Wafelbakkers LLC.(Kaemmerling, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by William Goodman Consent to Join Collective Action - - Trevon Alexander (Burks, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against De Wafelbakkers LLC filed by William Goodman. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072656.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. De Wafelbakkers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Goodman
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Wafelbakkers LLC
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?