Beck et al v. SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Bryant, Donna Zimmerman, Phyllis Williams, Bennie Latimer, Mae Jones, Joe Carl Hawkins, Joseph Gangluff, Judy Brown, Roger Hutchins, Rosemary Burgener, Sherry Jerrell, Neil Sponer, William Curtis Downey, Kevin Holland, LD Parish Investments LLC, Clemens Burgener, Richard Burgener, Geneva Gray, Jamie Rees, HRW Investment Inc, Raymond Luyet, James Harrison, Hill Top R V LLC, Michael Zimmerman, Mike Hensley, Joe Hipp, Judy Jacobs, Juanita Bryant, Barbara Mahan, Geraldine Edenfield, Diana Sponer, Joseph Gresham, Dorothy Gilreath, Brenda Holley, Margie Halman, Wanda Liddell, Johnson Family Minerals LLC, Karrie Gray, Myrtle Gottsponer, Mathilda Rossi, Dorothy Hawkins, James Briggler, Joyce Isom, Robert Sponer, Regina Gangluff, Mary Burgener, Alan Mahan, Naomia Thomas, Patricia Hallum, Theresa Hamling, Timothy Honeycutt, Clifton Gilreath, Sundot Inc, Kathy Johnston, John E Gunderman, Betty Luyet, Bobby Brown, Ronald Sponer, H C Wallace, John Gangluff, Edmund Gangluff, Daniel Beck, Ann Gangluff, Norbert Burgener, Doloros Gangluff, Floyd Jerrell, Linda Voss, Brenda Leonard, Marilyn Gunther, John Zimmerman, Marilyn Rose Hawkins, Hill Family Revocable Trust, Jesse Voss, Kelly Gross, Tim Honeycutt, Charlene Meaders, Charles Hallum, John Hart, David B Gunderman, Craig Jones, Linda Moore, Jim Carson, John Gottsponer, Jimmy and Barbara Thornberry Revocable Trust, Gary Maxwell, Susan McBride, Lawrence Williams, Joe Hensley, Rick Jacobs, Richard Mahan, Rossi Investments LLC, Robert Hall, David Mahan, Bilgischer Revocable Trust, Clemens Gottsponer, Jerry Kirkpatrick, Rita Sponer, James McBride, Fern Corbitt, Sheila Hensley, Emma Burgener, Edward Burgener, Wendy Gross, Thomas Gray, Sherman Jackson, Hawkins Revocable Trust, Robert Lee, Carolyn Gadberry, Alan Halman, Steve Meaders, Libby Hutchins, Charles Hamling, Gunderman Living Trust, Penn-Voss LLC, Junior Latimer, Mae Ella Lewis, Diana Beck, Brenda Sue Kay, Beverly Wallace, Sherry Burgener, Robert Downey, Lula McCoy, Joseph Neil, Eula Ledbetter, Trustee for the Napoleon and Birtha Criswell Sr Family Trust, Charles Corbitt, Stuart Leonard, Joseph Gunther, Dana Love, Diane Hensley, Darlene Carson, Gary Mahan, Alfred Zimmerman, Patricia Zimmerman, Steven Leonard, Linda Kirkpatrick, Clemens and Rose Mary Burgener Revocable Trust, Paul Edenfield, Jr, Donnie Honeycutt, Doyle Ledbetter, Emmet Gadberry, Megan Lockard, Julia Zimmerman, Paul Mahan, Dianna Jefferson, Sharon Bilgischer, Roy Leon Jackson, Sharon Ann Beck, Linda Haug, Janice Neil, Sue Nabors, Hubert Isom, Willie Fay Thomason Mahan and Sherry Honeycutt
Defendant: SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Southwestern Energy Company, Southwest Energy Company and Desoto Gathering Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00429
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/23/19. (rmg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/12/19. (rmg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Wyatt Dowling. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3494840. Filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Southwestern Energy Company (Tabolsky, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by R. Paul Yetter. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3494834. Filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Southwestern Energy Company (Tabolsky, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SWN Energy Services Company LLC, SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC, Southwest Energy Company, Southwestern Energy Company (King, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Southwestern Energy Company.(Tabolsky, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC.(King, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filers as SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC, Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC and Southwestern Energy Company. (thd)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #17 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 6/19/2019. (jak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for an Expedited Ruling on #14 the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for an Order that the 6/20/2019 Hearing will be Conducted by Telephone, by All Plaintiffs. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADMITTING BRANDON SCOTT WINCHESTER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 6/6/2019. (kdr) (Docket entry modified on 6/20/2019 to correct the file date) (jak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 3/17/2017. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendants Desoto Gathering Company, LLC, SWN Energy Services Company, LLC, and Southwestern Energy Company's Motion for Pro Hac vice Admission of Marc S. Tabolsky. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 1/27/2016. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Oppsition to #5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by All Plaintiffs. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendants DeSoto Gathering Company, LLC, SWN Energy Services Company, LLC, and Southwestern Energy Company's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of R. Paul Yetter. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 11/20/2015. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Defendant SWN Production (Arkansas), LLC's motion for Michael V. Powell to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 11/6/2015. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stacy A. Burrows. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Court Judge on 10/19/2015. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiffs' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of George A. Barton. Signed by Faulkner County Circuit Judge on 10/19/2015. (kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(kdr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Faulkner County Circuit Court, Case Number 23CV-15-934. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072658. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck et al v. SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Bryant
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Williams
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Latimer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Jones
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Carl Hawkins
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Brown
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hutchins
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Jerrell
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Sponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Curtis Downey
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Holland
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LD Parish Investments LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemens Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Gray
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Rees
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRW Investment Inc
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Luyet
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harrison
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Top R V LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hensley
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hipp
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Jacobs
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Bryant
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Edenfield
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gresham
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Gilreath
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Holley
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Halman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Liddell
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Family Minerals LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrie Gray
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Gottsponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathilda Rossi
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hawkins
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Briggler
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Isom
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomia Thomas
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hallum
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hamling
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Honeycutt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Gilreath
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundot Inc
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Johnston
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Gunderman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Luyet
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Brown
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H C Wallace
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Beck
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doloros Gangluff
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Jerrell
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Voss
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Leonard
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Gunther
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Rose Hawkins
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Family Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Voss
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Gross
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Honeycutt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Meaders
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hallum
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hart
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B Gunderman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jones
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moore
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Carson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gottsponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy and Barbara Thornberry Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Maxwell
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McBride
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hensley
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Jacobs
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossi Investments LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hall
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilgischer Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemens Gottsponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Sponer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McBride
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Corbitt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hensley
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Gross
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gray
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Jackson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawkins Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gadberry
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Halman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Meaders
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libby Hutchins
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hamling
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunderman Living Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Voss LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Latimer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Ella Lewis
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Beck
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sue Kay
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Wallace
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Burgener
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Downey
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula McCoy
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Neil
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eula Ledbetter
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee for the Napoleon and Birtha Criswell Sr Family Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Corbitt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Leonard
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gunther
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Love
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hensley
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Carson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Leonard
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemens and Rose Mary Burgener Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edenfield, Jr
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Honeycutt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle Ledbetter
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmet Gadberry
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Lockard
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Zimmerman
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Jefferson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Bilgischer
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Leon Jackson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ann Beck
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Haug
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Neil
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Nabors
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Isom
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Fay Thomason Mahan
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Honeycutt
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Represented By: Stacy A. Burrows
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Frederick Hart Davis
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Michael Vance Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Energy Services Company LLC
Represented By: Brandon Scott Winchester
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: Marc S. Tabolsky
Represented By: Thomas A. Daily
Represented By: Wyatt J. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: Brandon Scott Winchester
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: Marc S. Tabolsky
Represented By: Thomas A. Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Energy Company
Represented By: Wyatt J. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Gathering Company LLC
Represented By: Brandon Scott Winchester
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: Marc S. Tabolsky
Represented By: Thomas A. Daily
Represented By: Wyatt J. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?