Merrill et al v. Bernzomatic Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jared Gates and Shelton Merrill
Defendant: Worthington Industries Incorporated, Bernzomatic Inc, Lowe's Home Improvement LLC, Worthington Industries Inc, Worthington Cylinders Wisconsin LLC and Worthington Industries Inc Originally named as Worthington Industries Incorporated doing business as Bernzomatic Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00435
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shelton Merrill, Jared Gates(Sutter, Luther)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/16/2019. (stm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error based on the attached correspondence from the filing attorney. (jak)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sutter, Luther)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (Sutter, Luther)(Docket text modified on 8/16/2019 to indicate the document was filed in error)(jak)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by K. Gregory Stephens on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (kdr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shelton Merrill and Jared Gates.(kdr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Improvement LLC and Worthington Industries Incorporated from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-3563. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072686. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill et al v. Bernzomatic Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Gates
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By: K. Gregory Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Merrill
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By: K. Gregory Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernzomatic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Improvement LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries Inc
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Cylinders Wisconsin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries Inc Originally named as Worthington Industries Incorporated doing business as Bernzomatic Inc
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?