Henderson v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Contrell Henderson
Defendant: Toya Parker, Teague and Aaron
Case Number: 4:2019cv00441
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Plaintiff to submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/29/2019. (kdr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the prison, within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Saline Count Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/26/2019. (kdr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toya Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contrell Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?