Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Vaught et al
Plaintiff: Animal Equality, Food Chain Workers Alliance, Animal Legal Defense Fund and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught and Peco Foods Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00442
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Sur-Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muraskin, David)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #33 Motion for Leave to File. The issues can be adequately presented by the parties, and the amicus would not assist the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/23/19. (dpb)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs may file their sur-reply. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/23/19. (dpb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press re #34 Brief in Support, #33 MOTION for Leave to File (Gaines, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Jonathan and Deann Vaught's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Sur Reply filed by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught. (Rowe, Roger)
August 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #38 Brief in Support (Muraskin, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Peco Foods Inc. (Heister, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Jonathan and Deann Vaught's Opposition To Motion to File Amicus Brief filed by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught. (Rowe, Roger)
August 16, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Peco Foods Inc. (Heister, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #37 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document Sur-Reply)(Muraskin, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Sur-Reply)(Muraskin, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Peco Foods Inc. (Heister, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Reply Of Separate Defendants Jonathan And Deann Vaught To The Opposition Of Plaintiffs To Motion To Dismiss filed by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught. (Rowe, Roger)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #33 MOTION. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 8/12/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
August 12, 2019 Filing 34 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #33 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (jap)
August 12, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press (jap)(Docket entry modified on 8/13/2019 to correct the file date)(jak)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File reply. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (dpb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (dpb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Peco Foods Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Peco Foods Inc (Attachments: #1 Document)(Heister, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Motion Of Separate Defendants Jonathan And Deann Vaught For Leave To File A Reply To The Opposition Of Plaintiffs To Motion To Dismiss by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rowe, Roger)
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muraskin, David)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs have until August 5th to respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/26/19. (dpb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time and Consolidate Opposition by All Plaintiffs (Muraskin, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Motion to Dismiss filed by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught. (Rowe, Roger)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by DeAnn Vaught, Jonathan Vaught (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rowe, Roger)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Peco Foods Inc (Heister, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad W. Pekron on behalf of Peco Foods Inc (Pekron, Chad)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of Peco Foods Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of Peco Foods Inc (Heister, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Peco Foods Inc. (Heister, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Peco Foods Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heister, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Jonathan Vaught, filed by Food Chain Workers Alliance, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Animal Equality. Jonathan Vaught served on 7/1/2019. (Muraskin, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service on DeAnn Vaught, filed by Food Chain Workers Alliance, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Animal Equality. DeAnn Vaught served on 7/1/2019. (Muraskin, David)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , and #10 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Alan Keith Chen, Justin Francis Marceau, Matthew Glen Liebman, Cristina R. Stella, Kelsey Rinehart Eberly, and Matthew Daniel Strugar are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/11/2019. (ljb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. Hannah Mary Margaret Connor is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/11/2019. (ljb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. David Samuel Muraskin is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/11/2019. (ljb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Daniel Strugar. CORRECTION: The original image files were corrupt. The corrected documents were substituted as the attachments to docket entry #10 based on the attached correspondence. (thd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF PROVIDING COMPLAINT TO ATTORNEY GENERAL (Muraskin, David)
July 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Daniel Strugar. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491582. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sponsor, # 2 Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John) (The original image files were corrupt. The corrected image files were substituted as the attachment on 7/9/2019.) (thd).
July 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kelsey Rinehart Eberly. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491579. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John)
July 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Cristina R. Stella. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491576. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John)
July 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Glen Liebman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491575. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Document Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John)
July 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Justin Francis Marceau. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491574. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Document Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John)
July 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Alan Keith Chen. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491573. Filed by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Document Petition for PHV Admission)(Hays, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Hannah M. M. Connor. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491415. Filed by Center for Biological Diversity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Document PHV Petition of Hannah Connor)(Hays, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David S. Muraskin. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3491372. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sponsor, #2 Document PHV Petition of David Muraskin)(Hays, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Equality, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Biological Diversity, Food Chain Workers Alliance (Hays, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072732.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Vaught et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Equality
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Sarah Hanneken
Represented By: John Daniel Hays, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Represented By: Sarah K. Hanneken
Represented By: Alan Keith Chen
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Justin Francis Marceau
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food Chain Workers Alliance
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: John Daniel Hays, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Represented By: Alan Keith Chen
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Justin Francis Marceau
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Represented By: Kelsey Eberly
Represented By: Matthew Liebman
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: John Daniel Hays, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Chen
Represented By: Cristina Stella
Represented By: Justin Marceau
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Represented By: Alan Keith Chen
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Justin Francis Marceau
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: John Daniel Hays, Jr.
Represented By: Hannah Connor
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Strugar
Represented By: Alan Keith Chen
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: David Samuel Muraskin
Represented By: Hannah Mary Margaret Connor
Represented By: Justin Francis Marceau
Represented By: Kelsey Rinehart Eberly
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAnn Vaught
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Vaught
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peco Foods Inc
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?