Pettyjohn v. West Fraser Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Pettyjohn
Defendant: West Fraser Inc and Bid Group Construction US Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00451
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kevin Pettyjohn. (Stein, Carter)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Kevin Pettyjohn. Bid Group Construction US Inc served on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stein, Carter)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/15/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/23/19. (rmg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by West Fraser Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Koehler, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of West Fraser Inc (Pruitt, Lyn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by West Fraser Inc.(Koehler, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Koehler on behalf of West Fraser Inc (Koehler, David)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal and #3 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #1 was modified to correct the Pope County Circuit Court case number as 58CV-19-306 as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry #3 was modified to include reference to the Jury demand. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Bid Group Construction US Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bid Group Holdings (US) Inc and Corporate Parent Bid Group Holdings Ltd for Bid Group Construction US Inc. (kdr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial by Bid Group Construction US Inc. (kdr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury demand by Bid Group Construction US Inc.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Pettyjohn.(kdr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bid Group Construction US Inc from Pope County Circuit Court, case number 58CV-19-306. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072775. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)(Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to correct the case number from the Pope County Circuit Court)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettyjohn v. West Fraser Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Fraser Inc
Represented By: David Koehler
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bid Group Construction US Inc
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pettyjohn
Represented By: Carter C. Stein
Represented By: Sarah Coppola Jewell
Represented By: Charles D. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?