King v. Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quiana King
Defendant: Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC and Beacon Health Options Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00456
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/21/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/4/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/21/2019. (tmw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Beacon Health Options Inc, Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC.(Johnson, Louisa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Louisa J. Johnson on behalf of Beacon Health Options Inc, Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC (Johnson, Louisa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Beacon Health Options Inc (Johnson, Louisa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC (Johnson, Louisa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quiana King. Beacon Health Options Inc served on 7/15/2019; Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC served on 7/15/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 9, 2019 SUMMONSES Issued for Beacon Health Options Inc, Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC. and returned to plaintiff's attorney. (jap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED and Substituted Complaint against Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC, Beacon Health Options Inc, filed by Quiana King (jap)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed by at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2019. (jbh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC filed by Quiana King. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072790.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiana King
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Sean Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC
Represented By: Louisa J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Health Options Inc
Represented By: Louisa J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?