Beth v. Trumbull Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nora Ann Beth
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00459
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Trumbull Insurance Company. (Miller, Stuart)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File reply brief. Defendant may file its reply within five (5) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jerry D. Garner terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Trumbull Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Miller, Stuart)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jerry Garner by Nora Ann Beth (Steadman, Timothy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Trumbull Insurance Company. (Hargraves, Megan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Trumbull Insurance Company (Hargraves, Megan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 and #11 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Sharon D. Stuart and Edgar M. Elliott, IV are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/16/2019. (ljb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Edgar M. Elliott, IV. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3498943. Filed by Trumbull Insurance Company (Hargraves, Megan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sharon D. Stuart. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3498935. Filed by Trumbull Insurance Company (Hargraves, Megan)
July 11, 2019 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 9 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: This case is substantially similar to a case pending before the Honorable James M. Moody, Jr. --DuPriest, et al v. Allstate Insurance Company. Accordingly, based on General Order 29(b)(5) and for judicial efficiency, the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to Judge Moody. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/11/19. (dmm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/03/19. (dmm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trumbull Insurance Company (Miller, Stuart)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Trumbull Insurance Company (Miller, Stuart)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/5/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/28/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson.Entered at the direction of the Court on 6/28/19. (mmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Trumbull Insurance Company. (ljb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan D. Hargraves on behalf of Trumbull Insurance Company. (ljb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Trumbull Insurance Company filed by Nora Ann Beth. (ljb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trumbull Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-3654. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072798. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beth v. Trumbull Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Ann Beth
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: Edgar M. Elliott, IV
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Sharon D. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?