Humphrey v. Chuy's Opco Inc
Plaintiff: Tausha Humphrey
Defendant: Chuy's Opco Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00464
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/21/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/4/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/21/2019. (tmw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Paul DeCamp. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3514475. Filed by Chuy's Opco Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cross, J.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Maxine Adams. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3514473. Filed by Chuy's Opco Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cross, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Chuy's Opco Inc (Cross, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Chuy's Opco Inc.(Cross, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of Chuy's Opco Inc (Northen, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Bruce Cross on behalf of Chuy's Opco Inc (Cross, J.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tausha Humphrey. Chuy's Opco Inc served on 7/8/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/2/2019. (jbh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Chuy's Opco Inc filed by Tausha Humphrey. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072824.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Chuy's Opco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tausha Humphrey
Represented By: Blake Parker Hoyt
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuy's Opco Inc
Represented By: Maxine Adams
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Represented By: J. Bruce Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?