Wall v. Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc
Plaintiff: Brent Wall
Defendant: Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00465
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join--Thomas Paolino (Rheaume, April)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/9/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/22/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 7/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/1/19. (rmg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc (Carter, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Carter on behalf of Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc (Carter, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc.(Carter, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/1/2019. (jbh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc filed by Brent Wall. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072824.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal Hill Telecom Services US Inc
Represented By: Daniel R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Wall
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?