Hays et al v. Briggs Rentals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linsay Bradbury and Christopher Hays
Defendant: Briggs Rentals LLC and Bobby Briggs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00466
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bobby Briggs, Briggs Rentals LLC.(Lemley, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to All Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/2/2019. (sjh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Lemley, Kevin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Hays, Linsay Bradbury. Bobby Briggs served on 7/14/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Hays, Linsay Bradbury. Briggs Rentals LLC served on 7/8/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Christopher Hays, Linsay Bradbury. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072824.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays et al v. Briggs Rentals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs Rentals LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Briggs
Represented By: Kevin M. Lemley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linsay Bradbury
Represented By: Blake Parker Hoyt
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hays
Represented By: Blake Parker Hoyt
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?