Hodapp v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Herman M Hodapp
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Nucor Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00467
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to the #3 stipulation of dismissal, Nucor Corporation is dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/12/2019. (jbh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Nucor Corporation by Herman M Hodapp. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Herman M Hodapp. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 7/8/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Herman M Hodapp. ( Fee of $400. Receipt Number LIT072835. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodapp v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman M Hodapp
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?