Zornes v. Thompson Transportation Inc
Plaintiff: Leah Zornes
Defendant: Thompson Transportation Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00474
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/8/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/22/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/10/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley L. Fleisch-Djurica on behalf of All Defendants (Fleisch-Djurica, Shelley)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Thompson Transportation Inc.(Dobson, Allen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen C. Dobson on behalf of All Defendants (Dobson, Allen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Zornes. Thompson Transportation Inc served on 7/13/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thompson Transportation Inc filed by Leah Zornes. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072911.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zornes v. Thompson Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Transportation Inc
Represented By: Shelley L. Fleisch-Djurica
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Zornes
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?