Wilson v. Home to Community Living Inc
Plaintiff: Rosalind Wilson
Defendant: Home to Community Living Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00480
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Home to Community Living Inc. (Sutter, Luther)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Home to Community Living Inc (Sutter, Luther)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #6 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Replies due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/29/19. (zwt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Home to Community Living Inc (Sutter, Luther)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther Oneal Sutter on behalf of Home to Community Living Inc (Sutter, Luther)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalind Wilson. Home to Community Living Inc served on 7/15/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/9/2019. (thd)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/9/2019. (jbh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against Home to Community Living Inc, filed by Rosalind Wilson. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072961.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Home to Community Living Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Wilson
Represented By: Stacy Gibson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home to Community Living Inc
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?