May v. Allison
Plaintiff: Parnell R May
Defendant: Jeffery Allison and Jeff Allison
Case Number: 4:2019cv00483
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Parnell R May. (llg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Parnell R May. (llg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint, #2 Addendum, #3 Additional Addendum and #4 Evidence filed by Parnell R May. (llg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 EVIDENCE re #1 Complaint and #2 Addendum by Parnell R May. (ljb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Parnell R May. (llg)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Parnell R May. (ljb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Allison, filed by Parnell R May.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parnell R May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?