Baer v. Little Rock, City of
Plaintiff: Samuel Baer
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Case Number: 4:2019cv00486
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/7/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/21/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/1/19. (rmg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Peter Garcia on behalf of Little Rock, City of (Garcia, Caleb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Little Rock, City of.(Middlebrooks, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Middlebrooks on behalf of Little Rock, City of (Middlebrooks, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case, currently assigned to the docket of Judge Susan Webber Wright, because the City of Little Rock is on her recusal list. Signed at the direction of the Court on 7/11/2019. (kdr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Little Rock, City of, filed by Samuel Baer. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072989.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baer v. Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Represented By: Caleb Peter Garcia
Represented By: Andrew J. Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Baer
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?