Henderson v. Brasuell et al
Plaintiff: Contrell Henderson
Defendant: Mike Robinson, J Brent Standridge, Toney Brasuell and Jonathan Camp
Case Number: 4:2019cv00491
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #5 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Henderson's claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/3/2019. (ljb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Henderson to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a complete IFP application within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/31/2019. (ljb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Contrell Henderson. (llg)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS that you must pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion within 30 days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Henderson an IFP application. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2019. (ljb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Contrell Henderson.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Brasuell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Brent Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toney Brasuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contrell Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?