Camp v. Krispy Kreme
Plaintiff: John Camp
Defendant: Krispy Kreme
Case Number: 4:2019cv00493
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 8/15/2019 as to Krispy Kreme. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Order filed by John Camp. (fjg)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide the court his mailing address within 14 days from the entry date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to provide his mailing address within this timeframe, the Court will dismiss the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/23/2019. (jbh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Camp re Notice of Docket Correction (jap)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Camp re #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jap)(Docket text modified on 8/6/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
July 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Krispy Kreme and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice #3 motion for appointment of counsel; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/2019. (jbh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to the Court filed by John Camp. (fjg)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Camp. (jbh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 with Jury Demand against Krispy Kreme, filed by John Camp. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 7/15/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Camp. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp v. Krispy Kreme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krispy Kreme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?