Turner v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Carl Stanley Turner
Defendant: Eric Fleming, Sheri J Flynn, Adam Sexton, Matt Higgins, John Felts, Asa Hutchinson and Lindsey Moody
Case Number: 4:2019cv00496
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Judgment by Carl Stanley Turner. (cmn)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Carl Stanley Turner: Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee within 30 days of the date of this order. (cmn)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Carl Stanley Turner: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (cmn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 USCA Docketing Letter as to #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Carl Stanley Turner. USCA Case Number 19-2709. (cmn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #7 Notice of Appeal re #3 Order and #4 Judgment.(cmn)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/9/2019. (cmn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order, #4 Judgment by Carl Stanley Turner. (jbh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Carl Stanley Turner. (jbh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Turner's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2019. (jak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Turner's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. If Turner wants to pursue this case, then he must pay the $400 filing and administrative fees and file a motion to reopen this case by 8/26/2019. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2019. (jak)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carl Stanley Turner.(kdr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Stanley Turner. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri J Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Stanley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?