Davis Neurology PA v. DoctorDirectory.com LLC et al
Plaintiff: Davis Neurology PA
Defendant: John Does, DoctorDirectory.com LLC and Everyday Health Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00499
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric P. Schroeder; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian M. Underwood, Jr. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 09/11/2019. (rmg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian M. Underwood, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3530480. Filed by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc (Bacon, Donald)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Eric P. Schroeder. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3530474. Filed by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc (Bacon, Donald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED Document (jap)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Vathis)(Ashley, Joshua)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED Document (jap)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #13 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/6/19. (zwt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc (Ashley, Joshua)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/9/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/22/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/1/19. (rmg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Remand to State Court filed by Davis Neurology PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Streett, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Davis Neurology PA (Streett, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/18/19. (rmg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Maria Z. Vathis. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3500057. Filed by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc (Bacon, Donald)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Circuit Court Judge Dennis C. Sutterfield on 4/1/2019. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY AND SUPERSEDES IN PART. Signed by Circuit Court Judge Dennis C. Sutterfield on 4/16/2019. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by DoctorDirectory.com LLC and Everyday Health Inc. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc; Case Number 4:16-CV-95 and 4:16-cv-682. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Davis Neurology PA. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Davis Neurology PA. (ljb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DoctorDirectory.com LLC, Everyday Health Inc from Pope County Circuit Court, Case Number 58CV-16-40. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073035. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis Neurology PA v. DoctorDirectory.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DoctorDirectory.com LLC
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Represented By: Maria Z. Vathis
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Brian M. Underwood, Jr
Represented By: Eric P. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everyday Health Inc
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Represented By: Maria Z. Vathis
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Brian M. Underwood, Jr
Represented By: Eric P. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Neurology PA
Represented By: Joe P. Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Alex G. Streett
Represented By: James A. Streett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?