Wellons v. Emberton et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Eugene Wellons
Defendant: Gerrett, Jordan Dufranie, Mike Emlier, Lucas Emberton, Garrett Bagley, Holliman, Mike Shamoon, Addie Dufraine, Larry Reynolds and Darrell Elken
Case Number: 4:2019cv00511
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronnie Eugene Wellons re 18 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mike Shamoon served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Larry Reynolds served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Lucas Emberton served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Darrell Elken served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Addie Dufraine served on 8/19/2019. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronnie Eugene Wellons re #15 Motion to Dismiss. (fjg)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting the joint motion to dismiss the case with prejudice #17 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/26/2019. (lej)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Garrett Bagley, Jordan Dufranie, Mike Emlier, Holliman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Jorgensen, Colin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendants Emlier, Jordan Dufranie, Bagley, Holliman, Shamoon, Reynolds, and Addie Dufraine #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/22/2019. (lej)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronnie Eugene Wellons. (kdr)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
August 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Addie Dufraine, Darrell Elken, Lucas Emberton, Larry Reynolds, Mike Shamoon and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants Emberton, Shamoon, Reynolds, Addie Dufraine, and Elken without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/15/2019. (lej)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #10 Amended Complaint by Garrett Bagley, Jordan Dufranie, Mike Emlier, Holliman.(Jorgensen, Colin) (Docket text modified on 8/19/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin R. Jorgensen on behalf of Garrett Bagley, Jordan Dufranie, Mike Emlier, Holliman (Jorgensen, Colin)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ronnie Eugene Wellons against All Defendants" pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #5 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's claims against Lucas Emberton; dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's official capacity claims; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/2019. (ljb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ronnie Eugene Wellons against All Defendants. (ljb)(Docket entry modified on 8/13/2019 to correct the filing event pursuant to instruction from Chambers(jak).
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Holliman served on 7/29/2019. (fjg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gerrett served on 7/29/2019. (fjg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mike Emlier served on 7/29/2019. (fjg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jordan Dufranie served on 7/29/2019. (fjg)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jordan Dufranie, Mike Emlier, Gerrett, Holliman and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's claims against Lucas Emberton be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's official capacity claims be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/22/2019. (lej)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants Holliman, Emlier, Dufranie, and Gerrett without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/22/2019. (lej)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/22/2019. (lej)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronnie Eugene Wellons. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Eugene Wellons. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellons v. Emberton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Dufranie
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Emlier
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Emberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Bagley
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holliman
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Shamoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addie Dufraine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Elken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Eugene Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?