Turtle Island Foods SPC v. Soman
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Foods SPC
Defendant: Nikhil Soman
Case Number: 4:2019cv00514
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Notice of Hearing and Order", as indicated on the document. (kbc)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING and ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on #14 the request for preliminary injunction on Monday, 10/7/2019, beginning at 9 a.m. C.T. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas, Room No. 4C. The evidentiary record with respect to the motion for preliminary injunction will close at the conclusion of the 10/7/2019, hearing. If the parties wish to file supplemental briefings following the hearing, such simultaneous briefings are due by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 10/14/2019. The Court also directs the parties to exchange exhibits they intend to present and written lists of witnesses they will or may call at the preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 9/30/2019. If the parties wish to present rebuttal exhibits or witnesses at the hearing, the parties shall submit such rebuttal exhibits and written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Wednesday, 10/2/2019. If any party objects to the Courts consideration of exhibits already in the record in this matter, such objections must be made in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Thursday, 10/3/2019, and any responses to such objections must be in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T., on Friday, 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 to correct description. (kbc)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nikhil Soman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Act 501, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Nikhil Soman)(Garner, Jerry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 4 on DVD of the following: 2/27/19 Hearing of the Agriculture, Forestry & Economic Development Committee of the Arkansas House of Representatives concerning House Bill 1407; the March 4, 2019 floor session presentation of House Bill 1407 to the Arkansas House of Representatives; the March 13, 2019 floor presentation of House Bill 1407 to the Arkansas Senate. by Turtle Island Foods SPC re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (jap) [Exhibit 4 is maintained in the Clerk's Office files]
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 Athos Declaration, #2 Ex 2 Only Declaration, #3 Ex 3 Misenheimer Declaration)(Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nikhil Soman.(Garner, Jerry)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry D. Garner on behalf of Nikhil Soman (Garner, Jerry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Arkansas Attorney General of Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute by Turtle Island Foods SPC. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Liebman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3512728. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Amanda Howell. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3512714. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Turtle Island Foods SPC of Constitutional Challenge of Statute (Priebe, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF SUPPORTING Motion Seeking Leave to file Concurrently Mailed Amicus Reply as an Interested Party "IFP" re #6 Motion for Leave to File filed by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jap)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Seeking Leave to File Attached Amicus Reply as a Interested Party "IFP" by Curtis J Neeley, Jr (Attachments: #1 Document proposed amicus reply)(jap)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicole Manu. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3505886. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. Nikhil Soman served on 7/23/2019. (Priebe, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jessica Almy. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502584. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian Hauss. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502572. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Nikhil Soman, filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073114.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turtle Island Foods SPC v. Soman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turtle Island Foods SPC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Priebe
Represented By: Brian Hauss
Represented By: Matthew Glen Liebman
Represented By: Jessica Almy
Represented By: Amanda M Howell
Represented By: Amanda M. Howell
Represented By: Nicole D. Manu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikhil Soman
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?