Harrington v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Hope Harrington
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00531
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ADDENDUM filed by Hope Harrington to #3 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Signed Green Cards (Attachments: #1 Signed Green Card SSA Commissioner, #2 Signed Green Card US Attorney General)(Caddell, Freddie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Harrington. Social Security Administration served on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Stmnt w Respect to Svc SSA Commissioner, #2 Stmnt w Respect to Svc US Attorney General)(Caddell, Freddie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/19/2019. (jbh)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Hope Harrington. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073241.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Harrington
Represented By: Freddie L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?