Estate of Larry Brock v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Brock
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Golden State Medical Supply Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd and Does 1-100
Case Number: 4:2019cv00538
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. will have fourteen days after the JPML's ruling on the motion to transfer and expand the scope of MDL 2875, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/24/19. (amr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc (Simpson, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Larry Brock. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 9/3/2019. (Oliver, Alyson)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Larry Brock. Golden State Medical Supply Inc served on 9/6/2019. (Oliver, Alyson)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Estate of Larry Brock. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073284.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Larry Brock v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Medical Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Larry Brock
Represented By: Alyson Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?