Bassetti v. Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Bassetti
Defendant: Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00562
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Kevin Bassetti (Hill, Adam)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC. (ljb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Kevin Bassetti (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Entry of Default)(Hill, Adam)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Bassetti. Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC served on 8/20/2019. (Hill, Adam)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC filed by Kevin Bassetti. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073428.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 8/19/2019)) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassetti v. Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Credit & Collection Corporation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bassetti
Represented By: Adam Hill
Represented By: Adam Theodore Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?