Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection et al v. Gamber et al
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Leslie Rutledge and Arkansas, State of
Defendant: Andrew Gamber, Voyager Financial Group LLC, SoBell Corp and BAIC Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00565
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/4/2019. (kdr)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 joint motion for relief; vacating the previous #4 order and #5 judgment; and directing the parties to electronically sign the proposed order and submit it for entry. Jurisdiction is retained to enforce the order, but the clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/27/2019. (kdr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion for Relief from a Judgment or Order filed by Arkansas, State of. (Donoven, Katherine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Relief Relief from Order or Judgment by Arkansas, State of (Donoven, Katherine)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #4 order entered today, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/20/2019. (kdr) (VACATED pursuant to #8 Order.) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ljb).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The parties' #3 proposed stipulated final judgment and order is construed as a settlement agreement. Pursuant to #2 the joint stipulation of dismissal, judgment is entered for the plaintiffs, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Jurisdiction is retained to enforce the settlement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/20/2019. (kdr) (VACATED pursuant to #8 Order.) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ljb).
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Settlement Agreement. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage, correct the party filer, and correct the description of the document filed as "EXHIBIT (Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order) re: #2 Stipulation filed by Arkansas, State of." (thd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT (Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order) re: #2 Stipulation filed by Arkansas, State of. (Donoven, Katherine) (Docket entry modified on 8/15/2019 to establish linkage, correct the party filer, and correct the description of the document filed.)(thd).
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Entry of Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order by Arkansas, State of. (Donoven, Katherine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Leslie Rutledge, and Arkansas, State of. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073458. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection et al v. Gamber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Katherine Anne Donoven
Represented By: Lane Powell
Represented By: Benjamin Konop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Katherine Anne Donoven
Represented By: Lane Powell
Represented By: Benjamin Konop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Katherine Anne Donoven
Represented By: Lane Powell
Represented By: Benjamin Konop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voyager Financial Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoBell Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAIC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?