Foster et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary Susan Dubinsky, Amy Slane, Tina Brown, Jessica Beall, Chris Pettit, Kris Cunningham, Gloria Czigle, Lillian Rudd, Dianne Walton, Clarence Gaten, Amanda Rhorer, John Almquist, Jr, Monica Robinson, T W Prescott, Leonshay Tuller, Donnie Brown, Brian Rush, Frederick Coffey, Heidi Horne, Justin Castilyn, Joe Esquivel, Talitha Hofflerr-Frazier, Jodie Roskydoll, Jennifer Edmark, Brenda Shaley, Pearlie Boyd, Ryan D'Angelo, Torrin Perry and Gracie Foster
Defendant: Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc and Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00571
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent O. Chadick on behalf of Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC (Chadick, Vincent)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to file response re #1 complaint. Response due 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/2019. (stm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC (Tull, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad W. Pekron on behalf of Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC (Pekron, Chad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC (Tull, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Esquivel, T W Prescott, Heidi Horne, Dianne Walton, Brenda Shaley, Monica Robinson, Mary Susan Dubinsky, Gracie Foster, Amanda Rhorer, John Almquist, Jr, Jodie Roskydoll, Lillian Rudd, Leonshay Tuller, Clarence Gaten, Jessica Beall, Pearlie Boyd, Chris Pettit, Jennifer Edmark, Amy Slane, Gloria Czigle, Brian Rush, Ryan D'Angelo, Tina Brown, Talitha Hofflerr-Frazier, Frederick Coffey, Justin Castilyn, Donnie Brown, Torrin Perry, Kris Cunningham. Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC served on 8/29/2019. (Brown, Donald)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Esquivel, T W Prescott, Heidi Horne, Dianne Walton, Brenda Shaley, Monica Robinson, Mary Susan Dubinsky, Gracie Foster, Amanda Rhorer, John Almquist, Jr, Jodie Roskydoll, Lillian Rudd, Leonshay Tuller, Clarence Gaten, Jessica Beall, Pearlie Boyd, Chris Pettit, Jennifer Edmark, Amy Slane, Gloria Czigle, Brian Rush, Ryan D'Angelo, Tina Brown, Talitha Hofflerr-Frazier, Frederick Coffey, Justin Castilyn, Donnie Brown, Torrin Perry, Kris Cunningham. Walmart Inc served on 8/29/2019. (Brown, Donald)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Esquivel, T W Prescott, Heidi Horne, Dianne Walton, Brenda Shaley, Monica Robinson, Mary Susan Dubinsky, Gracie Foster, Amanda Rhorer, John Almquist, Jr, Jodie Roskydoll, Lillian Rudd, Leonshay Tuller, Clarence Gaten, Jessica Beall, Pearlie Boyd, Chris Pettit, Jennifer Edmark, Amy Slane, Gloria Czigle, Brian Rush, Ryan D'Angelo, Tina Brown, Talitha Hofflerr-Frazier, Frederick Coffey, Justin Castilyn, Donnie Brown, Torrin Perry, Kris Cunningham. Walmart Stores East LP served on 8/29/2019. (Brown, Donald)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig R. Heidemann; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nickolas W. Allen. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/23/2019. (rmg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nickolas W. Allen. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3525105. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Brown, Donald)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Craig R. Heidemann. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3525095. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Brown, Donald)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon S. Almonrode; granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily E. Hughes. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/23/2019. (rmg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Emily E. Hughes filed by All Plaintiffs. Fee of $100 paid, Receipt #LIT073569. (ljb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sharon S. Almonrode filed by All Plaintiffs. Fee of $100 paid, Receipt #LIT073568. (ljb)
August 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Walmart Inc, Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC and returned to plaintiffs' counsel (jap)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by all Plaintiffs. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073484. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East LP
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores of Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Susan Dubinsky
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Slane
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Brown
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Beall
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Pettit
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Cunningham
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Czigle
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Rudd
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Walton
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Gaten
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Rhorer
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Almquist, Jr
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Robinson
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T W Prescott
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonshay Tuller
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Brown
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rush
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Coffey
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Horne
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Castilyn
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Esquivel
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talitha Hofflerr-Frazier
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Roskydoll
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Edmark
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Shaley
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlie Boyd
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D'Angelo
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrin Perry
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie Foster
Represented By: Q. Byrum Hurst, Jr.
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Donald M. Brown
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Craig R. Heidemann
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Nickolas W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?