USA v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Petit Jean State Bank, David Keith Williams and Belinda Dawn Williams
Case Number: 4:2019cv00592
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by USA. Belinda Dawn Williams served on 8/24/2019. (Pence, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by USA. David Keith Williams served on 8/24/2019. (Pence, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by USA. Petit Jean State Bank served on 9/6/2019. (Pence, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Separate Answer of Petit Jean State Bank ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Petit Jean State Bank.(Yates, Howard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard C. Yates on behalf of Petit Jean State Bank (Yates, Howard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against All Defendants, filed by USA. Filing Fee waived. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petit Jean State Bank
Represented By: Howard C. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Keith Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Dawn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?