Smith v. Baptist Health et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Smith
Defendant: Parkway Health Center Inc and Baptist Health
Case Number: 4:2019cv00600
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren S. Grinder on behalf of Baptist Health, Parkway Health Center Inc (Grinder, Lauren)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathlyn Graves on behalf of Baptist Health, Parkway Health Center Inc (Graves, Kathlyn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/2/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/16/2019. Bench Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 9/23/19. (mmb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury demand by Baptist Health, Parkway Health Center Inc.(Freeland, Byron) (Docket text modified on 9/24/2019 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron L. Freeland on behalf of Baptist Health, Parkway Health Center Inc (Freeland, Byron)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Smith. Baptist Health served on 9/3/2019; Parkway Health Center Inc served on 9/3/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Melissa Smith. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073630.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Baptist Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Smith
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkway Health Center Inc
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Represented By: Lauren S. Grinder
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Represented By: Lauren S. Grinder
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?