Thomason v. Denton
Plaintiff: David Thomason
Defendant: Rickey A Denton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00601
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #7 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/3/2019. (jbh)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #5 Proposed Findings and Recommendations; dismissing #2 Plaintiff's Complaint, without prejudice; counting the dismissal as a "strike"; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/3/2019. (jbh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Thomason. (ljb)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Judge Wright dismiss #2 David Thomason's Complaint without prejudice based on his failure to state a claim; count dismissal as a "strike;" and certify that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action be considered frivolous and not in good faith Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/6/2019. (kdr)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account until the statutory filing fee is paid in full; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Tucker Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/5/2019. (kdr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL referring the above-styled case to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney for further proceedings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/4/2019. (jbh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rickey A Denton filed by David Thomason. (ljb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Thomason. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomason v. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey A Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?