Bokony et al v. Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Bruce H Bokony and Brandon H Bokony
Defendant: Does United States Navy Personnel Command, Jeff W Hughes, Department of Defense and Department of the Navy
Case Number: 4:2019cv00608
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 10:1552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail as to United States Navy c/o Admiral Michael Gilday by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail as to Litigation Counsel's Office, General Counsel of the U. S. Department of Defense by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail as to Honorable Cody Hiland, U. S. Attorney, Eastern District of Arkansas by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. William Barr, Attorney General was served on 9/9/19. Filed by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the Navy was served on 9/11/19. Filed by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. General Counsel of the Navy Litigation Office was served on 9/13/19. Filed by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED Affidavit of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail by Bruce H Bokony. #13 (jap)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Affidavit of Service and Notice of Docket Correction. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error to docket entry #11 due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. The docket text for the Notice of Docket Correction was modified to indicate the docket entry was filed in error. (jak)
September 23, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (jak)(Docket text modified on 9/24/2019 to indicate the docket entry was filed in error) (jak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service by Certified Mail by Bruce H Bokony. United States Department of Defense served on 9/9/19 (jap)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail by Bruce H Bokony. Dr. Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Defense/Department of Defense served on 9/10/2019. (jap)(Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. RADM Jeff W. Hughes served on 9/5/19 by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. U. S. Navy Personnel Command c/o RADM Jeff W. Hughes served on 9/5/19 by Bruce H Bokony. (jap)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Process by Certified Mail. Executed by Bruce H Bokony. (Office of Legal Counsel, U. S. Navy Personnel Command), Department of the Navy served on 9/5/2019. (jap)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice as premature #2 Motion for summary judgment. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe to handle all preliminary matters, including a recommendation on any dispositive motion and whether the Bokonys are entitled to declaratory or injunctive relief. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2019. (jak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Statement of Facts. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (lack of signature on file mark). The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (lack of signature on file mark). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
September 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, Department of the Navy, Does, Jeff W Hughes. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #2 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Brandon H Bokony and Bruce H Bokony. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #2 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Brandon H Bokony and Bruce H Bokony. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brandon H Bokony and Bruce H Bokony. (kdr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Bruce H Bokony and Brandon H Bokony. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073700. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bokony et al v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does United States Navy Personnel Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff W Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce H Bokony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon H Bokony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?