Baugh v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Marion Baugh
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00611
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 9/24/2019. (fjg)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the date of service as U.S. Attorney served on 9/23/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Attorney served on 9/23/2019. (ajt) (Docket text modified on 10/2/2019 to correct the date of service) (jak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration - Office of the Regional Chief Counsel served on 9/25/2019. (ajt)
September 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to file and docket the Complaint, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor, and issue summons for Defendant, US Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and the US Attorney General; directing the USMS to serve the summons, #2 Complaint and this Order without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/6/2019. (kdr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Marion Baugh.(kdr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marion Baugh. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baugh v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Baugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?