Roberts v. AutoZoners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dejon J Roberts
Defendant: Edgar Swims and AutoZoners LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00631
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/30/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/9/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/18/2019. (rmg)
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #1 Complaint. (jak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AutoZoners LLC, Edgar Swims.(Jones, Stephen)(Docket text modified on 10/18/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by P.J. Kee. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/09/2019. (rmg)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tracy E. Kern. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/09/2019. (rmg)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/07/2019. (rmg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by P.J. Kee. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3551048. Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A)(Jones, Stephen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Tracy E. Kern. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3551038. Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A)(Jones, Stephen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Stephen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Stephen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dejon J Roberts. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073856. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. AutoZoners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejon J Roberts
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Swims
Represented By: P. J. Kee
Represented By: Tracy E. Kern
Represented By: Stephen W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZoners LLC
Represented By: P. J. Kee
Represented By: Tracy E. Kern
Represented By: Stephen W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?