Williams v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Joe Williams
Defendant: Ashdown Police Department, Zane Butler and Mickey Buchanan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00632
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 9/16/2019 as marked on the Order. (jak)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Western District of Arkansas, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 4:19-cv-04126. (jak)
September 17, 2019 Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas on this date. (kdr)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer the entire case file to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/16/2019. (kdr) (Docket entry modified on 10/29/2019 to correct the file date)(jak)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Williams. (ljb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joe Williams. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashdown Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?