Hickman v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Hickman
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00633
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sarah Hickman. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron L. Freeland on behalf of Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Freeland, Byron)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/07/2019. (rmg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Koehler, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Koehler on behalf of Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Koehler, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Sarah Hickman. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 9/23/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Sarah Hickman. Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/17/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sarah Hickman. (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT073911. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hickman
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironwood Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?