Automotive Lift Institute Inc v. MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co
Plaintiff: Automotive Lift Institute Inc
Defendant: MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co
Case Number: 4:2019cv00637
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/04/2019. (tmw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co. (Attachments: #1 Document Entry of Appearance)(Thrash, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
September 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co, filed by Automotive Lift Institute Inc. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073929.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Lift Institute Inc v. MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEC/McDaniel Equipment Co
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Lift Institute Inc
Represented By: Roger H. Fitzgibbon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?