Jackson v. White County Fair Association Incorporated
Plaintiff: Sharon Jackson
Defendant: White County Fair Association Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00642
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (jak)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/9/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/24/2019. (slb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by White County Fair Association Incorporated.(Owens, Jason)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooklyn Rae Parker on behalf of White County Fair Association Incorporated (Parker, Brooklyn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Owens on behalf of White County Fair Association Incorporated (Owens, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to White County Fair Association Incorporated and returned to counsel for service. (kdr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against White County Fair Association Incorporated, filed by Sharon Jackson. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073952. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. White County Fair Association Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jackson
Represented By: Stacy Gibson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White County Fair Association Incorporated
Represented By: Brooklyn Rae Parker
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?