Sims v. Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Sims
Defendant: Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA, Michael L Spann and Kristy Spann
Case Number: 4:2019cv00653
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Coppola Jewell on behalf of Rachel Sims (Jewell, Sarah)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff has until Friday, November 22, 2019, to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/14/19. (dpb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rachel Sims (Coulter, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by Michael L Spann, Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA, Kristy Spann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counterclaim Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Counterclaim Exhibit B)(Gardner, Karey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Karey Weeks Gardner on behalf of All Defendants (Gardner, Karey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Mallard, Gabriel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Mallard, Gabriel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Douglas Mallard on behalf of All Defendants (Mallard, Gabriel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Michael L. Spann, M.D., filed by Rachel Sims. Michael L Spann served on 10/10/2019. (Coulter, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Little Rock Plastic Surgery, P.A., filed by Rachel Sims. Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA served on 10/10/2019. (Coulter, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Kristy Spann, filed by Rachel Sims. Kristy Spann served on 10/10/2019. (Coulter, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFIED First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Money Damages against Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA, Kristy Spann, Michael L Spann, filed by Rachel Sims. Summons issued and given to attorney for plaintiff as to defendants Little Rock Plastic Surgery, P.A., Michael Spann, M.D., and Kristy Spann. (jap)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONEY DAMAGES against All Defendants filed by Rachel Sims. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073996.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Plastic Surgery PA
Represented By: Karey Weeks Gardner
Represented By: Gabriel Douglas Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Spann
Represented By: Karey Weeks Gardner
Represented By: Gabriel Douglas Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Spann
Represented By: Karey Weeks Gardner
Represented By: Gabriel Douglas Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Sims
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Represented By: Sarah Coppola Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?