Southwestern Bell Telephone Company v. Massada Inc
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Defendant: Massada Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00691
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Pickell, J.)
November 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Pickell, J.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER #2 , Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand against KGPCo Inc, COUNTERCLAIM against Southwestern Bell Telephone Company by Massada Inc. (jap) (3rd-party summons issued and given to defendant's attorney for service upon KGPCo, Inc.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant has until October 29, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/7/19. (dpb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Massada Inc (Smith, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Massada Inc filed by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Massada Inc from Saline County Circuit Court, Case Number 63CV-19-954-3. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074184. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company v. Massada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: J. Slocum Pickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massada Inc
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?