Alexander v. Stryker Corp et al
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Alexander
Defendant: J F Jelenko & Co Inc, John Does, Danaher Corporation, Dentsply Sirona Inc, Stryker Corp, Kerr Corporation, Argen Corporation, Kerr Dental and Envista Holdings Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00700
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail, filed by Linda Sue Alexander. Dentsply Sirona Inc served on 11/25/2019. (Moody, Reed)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail, filed by Linda Sue Alexander. Kerr Corporation served on 11/22/2019. (Moody, Reed)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail, filed by Linda Sue Alexander. Stryker Corp served on 11/25/2019. (Moody, Reed)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dentsply Sirona Inc. answer due 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/02/2019. (pgt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Dentsply Sirona Inc (Brick, Phillip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip M. Brick, Jr on behalf of Dentsply Sirona Inc (Brick, Phillip)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED Civil Complaint with Jury Demand against Dentsply Sirona Inc, John Does, Stryker Corporation, Argen Corporation, Kerr Corporation, Envista Holdings Corporation filed by plaintiff. (Summons issued and given to attorney for plaintiff as to Stryker Corporation, Envista Holdings Corporation, Dentsply Sirona, Inc., Kerr Corporation) (jap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 (This is a TEXT ENTRY Only. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (thd)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Stryker Corp., Howmedica, Inc., J F Jelenko & Co Inc, Dentsply Sirona Inc, Danaher Corporation, Kerr Corporation and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Linda Sue Alexander. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074261.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Stryker Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J F Jelenko & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danaher Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentsply Sirona Inc
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr Dental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envista Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Alexander
Represented By: Reed Edward Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?