Winningham v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Robert Winningham
Defendant: Kendra Roberts, Russell, Elliott Wagner, M Bohan and Turn Key Health
Case Number: 4:2019cv00706
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Russell served on 11/12/2019. (fjg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kendra Roberts served on 11/12/2019. (fjg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. M Bohan served on 11/12/2019. (fjg)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Russell. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Russell (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kendra Roberts. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kendra Roberts (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by M Bohan. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by M Bohan (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of M Bohan, Kendra Roberts, Russell (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety; and dismissing Defendants Wagner and Turn Key Health from this action, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/19/2019. (ljb)
November 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to M Bohan, Kendra Roberts and Russell. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summons for Defendants KendraRoberts, M. Bohan, and Nurse Russell; and directing the USMS to serve a copy of #5 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/31/2019. (kdr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants Wagner and Turn Key Health be dismissed from this action, without prejudice. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/31/2019. (kdr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Winningham.(kdr)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account and forwarded to the Clerk, until a total of $350 has been collected; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Pine Bluff Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/17/2019. (kdr)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/17/2019. (lmc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Winningham.(kdr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Winningham. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winningham v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Winningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Roberts
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bohan
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?