Arnette v. Little Rock Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Dana Arnette
Defendant: Little Rock Housing Authority
Case Number: 4:2019cv00724
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 41:1463
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/26/2020; and Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/6/2019. (hml)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY Only. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (thd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Little Rock Housing Authority.(Wineland, Teresa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Little Rock Housing Authority.(Wineland, Teresa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa M. Wineland on behalf of Little Rock Housing Authority (Wineland, Teresa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED and Substituted Complaint with Jury Demand against Little Rock Housing Authority, filed by Dana Arnette(jap)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Little Rock Housing Authority filed by Dana Arnette. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074390.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnette v. Little Rock Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Housing Authority
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Arnette
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?