Collison v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: John Collison
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00731
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/30/2019. (ljb)
October 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ajt)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Collison's counsel is directed to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/25/2019. (ajt)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by John Collison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Collison. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collison v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Collison
Represented By: Randolph M. Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?