BACA International Inc v. Ragsdale et al
Plaintiff: BACA International Inc
Defendant: Andrew Mariani, John Doe and Mike Ragsdale
Case Number: 4:2019cv00757
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Mariani, Mike Ragsdale. (Creasman, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Andrew Mariani, Mike Ragsdale (Creasman, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendants have through 12/15/2019, to file a responsive pleading to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/26/2019. (kdr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Creasman on behalf of Andrew Mariani, Mike Ragsdale (Creasman, William)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Andrew Mariani, Mike Ragsdale. (Creasman, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by BACA International Inc. Andrew Mariani served on 11/11/2019. (Calhoun, Bart)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as Mike Ragsdale on 11/1/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by BACA International Inc. Mike Ragsdale served on 11/1/2019. (Calhoun, Bart) (Docket text modified on 11/7/2019 to correct the party served)(jak)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark submitted by the Clerk's office to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on 10/30/2019. (cdw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by BACA International Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074513. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BACA International Inc v. Ragsdale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mariani
Represented By: William P. Creasman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ragsdale
Represented By: William P. Creasman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BACA International Inc
Represented By: Bart Widener Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?