Gilliam v. Staley et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Defendant: Marige Grigsby, John Staley, Kevin Smith and Matthew Hodge
Case Number: 4:2019cv00769
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/20/2020. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/20/2019. (lej)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Marige Grigsby, Matthew Hodge, Kevin Smith, John Staley.(Thomas, JaNan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Marige Grigsby, Matthew Hodge, Kevin Smith, John Staley (Thomas, JaNan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Richard Gilliam. (llg)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/6/2019. (lej)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #1 . Service is not appropriate at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint,' and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient, and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/6/2019. (lej)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Staley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marige Grigsby
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Staley
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hodge
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?