Johnson v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00788
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Larry Johnson. GEICO General Insurance Company served on 10/28/2019. (Franks, Brianne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by GEICO General Insurance Company. and Larry Johnson (Drennon, Baxter)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Daniel Hornung on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Hornung, Nicholas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company.(kdr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against GEICO General Insurance Company, filed by Larry Johnson.(kdr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-7401. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT074719. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Represented By: Brianne A. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Hornung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?