Dorsey v. Arkansas, State of
Plaintiff: Curtis Dorsey
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2019cv00797
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dorsey's case be dismissed without prejudice; and that Judgment should be entered for respondent State of Arkansas. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/6/2020. (ljb)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Dorsey the standard form for filing a petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254; strongly encouraging Dorsey to complete the standard 28 U.S.C. 2254 form in full; allowing Dorsey until 12/23/2019 to complete the form and file it with the Clerk of the Court as an amended petition; directing the Clerk of the Court to send Dorsey the standard form for filing a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Dorsey to either pay the five dollar filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis using the standard form he is provided; and giving Dorsey until 12/26/2019 to either pay the five dollar filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. In the event Dorsey fails to comply with the terms of this Order by 12/26/2019, the Court will recommend that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Service of process will not be ordered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/25/2019. (jbh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Curtis Dorsey. (ljb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Curtis Dorsey. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?