Doe v. Seven Star Hotels Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Rajni Patel, John Does, Seven Star Hotels Group Inc, Lina Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC, Vijay Patel and Vijay Brahmbhatt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00834
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 31 SEALED Document (jap)
January 17, 2020 Filing 30 FOURTH AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against John Does, Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Seven Star Hotels Group Inc, Shri Jinasha LLC, Vijay Brahmbhatt, filed by Jane Doe (summons issued and returned to plaintiff's attorney) (jap)
January 15, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand (ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT) by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC.(Huckabay, D.)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #25 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Party and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant Vijay Patel is DISMISSED. Plaintiff must conventionally file the amended complaint, that was attached as an exhibit, by 5 p.m., Wednesday, January 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/15/20. (dmm)
January 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #26 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and correct the description of the document filed as "EXHIBIT - Proposed Amended Complaint re #25 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint." (thd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Reid Hoggard on behalf of Jane Doe (Hoggard, Denise)
January 13, 2020 Filing 26 EXHIBIT - Proposed Amended Complaint re #25 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Jane Doe(Moore, Meredith) (Docket entry modified on 1/13/2020 to establish linkage and correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
January 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Party Vijay Patel, MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint () by Jane Doe (Moore, Meredith)
January 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC - DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huckabay, D.)
January 6, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #22 Third Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Third Amended Complaint was filed against All Defendants as marked on the document. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 SEALED Document (jap)
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Doe Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Molly Smith, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Kathy Bryan)(Moore, Meredith) (Docket text modified on 1/6/2020 to correct the party filers) (jak)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to File it Under Seal. Plaintiff is directed to conventionally file both a redacted and unredacted Third Amended Complaint by 5 p.m., Monday, January 13, 2020. The redactions will be limited to paragraphs 32, 33, and the part on paragraph 38 starting with "when being" and ending before "being overwhelmed." The unredacted version will be filed under seal. Defendants' #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED without prejudice. It appears to me that discovery is needed to flesh out the issues raised in the motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/06/20. (dmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #19 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Jane Doe. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jane Doe. (llg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - Memorandum of Law In Support, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jane Doe. (Moore, Meredith)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jane Doe as to Seven Star Hotels Group Inc. (Moore, Meredith)
December 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 16 Text Entry Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date as 12/9/2019 and the reply date as 1/3/2020. (jak)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Accordingly, Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss #7 must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, January 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/09/19. (dmm)(Docket text modified on 12/10/2019 to correct the signature and reply dates) (jak)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC. (Huckabay, D.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jane Doe (Manatt, Lauren)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #5 Defendants' Motion for Jury Trial, since they made the same request in their answer. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/05/19. (dmm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/10/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/2/19. (mmb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #10 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/2/2019. (jbh)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed and to establish linkage as "MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #7 Motion to Dismiss by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC" as marked on the document. (jak)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Subject to Motion to Dismiss by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC.(Huckabay, D.)
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #7 Motion to Dismiss by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC (Huckabay, D.) (Docket text modified on 12/2/2019 to correct the linkage and description of the document filed) (jak)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC (Huckabay, D.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Bess Knisley on behalf of Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC (Knisley, Kathryn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC (Huckabay, D.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe. (jbh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Seven Star Hotels Group Inc, filed by Jane Doe. (jbh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Seven Star Hotels Group Inc, filed by Jane Doe. (jbh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lina Patel, Rajni Patel, Shri Jinasha LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-6741. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074914. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Seven Star Hotels Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajni Patel
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Star Hotels Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Patel
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shri Jinasha LLC
Represented By: D. Michael Huckabay, Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Bess Knisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vijay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vijay Brahmbhatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Meredith S. Moore
Represented By: Lauren Alexander Manatt
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?