Barkley et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: Travis Barkley and Jeffrey Burfeind
Defendant: Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America and Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00847
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 02/05/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 01/06/2020. (rmg)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alexander on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America (Alexander, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America (Miller, Stuart)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America (Miller, Stuart)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service Quapaw Area Council, filed by Travis Barkley. Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America served on 12/18/2019. (Gillispie, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service Boy Scouts of America, filed by Travis Barkley. Boy Scouts of America served on 12/18/2019. (Gillispie, Joshua)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Travis Barkley and Jeffrey Burfeind. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074962. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkley et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quapaw Area Council Incorporated of the Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: John Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Barkley
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Burfeind
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?